blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0769376

EP0769376 - Sheet-fed printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DE LA RUE GIORI S.A.
4, rue de la Paix
1003 Lausanne / CH
[2000/18]
Former [1997/17]For all designated states
DE LA RUE GIORI S.A.
4, rue de la Paix
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Schaede, Johannes Georg
Lortzingstrasse 1
97074 Wurzburg / DE
[1997/17]
Representative(s)Jörchel, Dietrich R.A., et al
c/o BUGNION S.A. Case postale 375
1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH
[1997/17]
Application number, filing date96810654.201.10.1996
[1997/17]
Priority number, dateCH1995000299320.10.1995         Original published format: CH 299395
[1997/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0769376
Date:23.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0769376
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1997
ClassificationIPC:B41F21/10
[1997/17]
CPC:
B41F21/102 (EP,US); B41F21/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1997/17]
TitleGerman:Bogendruckmaschine[1997/17]
English:Sheet-fed printing machine[1997/17]
French:Machine d'impression de feuilles[1997/17]
Examination procedure29.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2000Fee for grant paid
27.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1917795  (DE LA RUE GIORI SA) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2252231  (KOENIG & BAUER AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0161531  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]EP0167861  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]);
 [A]US4660825  (UMEZAWA MICHIO [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]DE3710341  (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0722900  (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.