blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0781967

EP0781967 - Annular combustion chamber for gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
[2003/14]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [1997/27]For all designated states
ABB RESEARCH LTD.
Affolternstrasse 52
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Döbbeling, Klaus, Dr.
Schachenweg 6
5200 Windisch / CH
[1997/27]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2002/48]
Former [2002/01]Liebe, Rainer, et al
ALSTOM (Switzerland)Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Haselstrasse 16/699/5.OG
5401 Baden / CH
Former [1997/27]Pöpper, Evamaria, Dr., et al
Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date96810777.112.11.1996
[1997/27]
Priority number, dateDE199514914329.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19549143
[1997/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0781967
Date:02.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0781967
Date:07.04.1999
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0781967
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:F23R3/04, F23R3/10, F23R3/28, F23R3/50
[1997/27]
CPC:
F23R3/10 (EP,US); F23R3/045 (EP,US); F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/50 (EP,US); F23R2900/03041 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/27]
TitleGerman:Gasturbinenringbrennkammer[1997/27]
English:Annular combustion chamber for gas turbine[1997/27]
French:Chambre de combustion annulaire pour turbine à gaz[1997/27]
Examination procedure14.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
23.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2288010  (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [X] 1,6,7,9-11 * figure - * [Y] 1-3,5;
 [Y]US2627721  (ROSENLUND IVER T) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 12 - line 33; figure - *;
 [Y]US4177637  (PASK GEORGE [GB]) [Y] 1,6,7,9-11,13 * column 2; figure - *;
 [Y]US4455840  (MATT BERNHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,9-11,13 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0651207  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-3,7,10 * column 2, paragraph 1; figure - *
by applicant   - H. NEUHOFF, K. THOREN, "Die neuen Gasturbinen GT 24 und GT 26 - hohe Wirkungsgrade dank sequentieller Verbrennung", ABB TECHNIK, (1994), vol. 2, pages 4 - 7
    - D. VIERECK, "Die Gasturbine GT13E2 - ein richtungsweisendes Konzept fuer die Zukunft", ABB TECHNIK, (1993), vol. 6, pages 11 - 16
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.