Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742581

EP0742581 - Sealed cavity arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SENSONOR ASA
Knudsrodveien 7
3192 Horten / NO
[2002/47]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SENSONOR ASA
Knutsrodveien 7
3192 Horten / NO
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
SENSONOR A.S.
Knutsrodveien 7
N-3189 Horten / NO
Inventor(s)01 / Jakobsen, Henrik
Blaveisstien 11
3183 Horten / NO
02 / Kvisteroy, Terje
Hans Gudesgt. 1
3190 Horten / NO
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Perklev, Karin Cecilia , et al
AWAPATENT AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Perklev, Karin Cecilia , et al
AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date96850075.111.04.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateUS1995042166512.04.1995         Original published format: US 421665
[1996/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0742581
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0742581
Date:02.05.1997
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742581
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, G01L9/00, G01P15/08
[1997/04]
Former International [1996/46]H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Versiegelte Hohlraumanordnung[1996/46]
English:Sealed cavity arrangement[1996/46]
French:Dispositif à cavité scellée[1996/46]
Examination procedure26.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
24.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2002Fee for grant paid
23.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IT27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
ES29.05.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2005/02]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE11.04.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/04]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE27.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4291293  (YAMADA KAZUJI, et al) [AD] 1-25 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 49 *;
 [A]EP0280905  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-25 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH05273231  ;
 [E]JPH0875779
 [A]  - BOXENHORN B ET AL, "MONOLITHIC SILICON ACCELEROMETER", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, (19900201), vol. A21, no. 1 / 03, pages 273 - 277, XP000246783 [A] 1-25 * figures 2,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(90)85053-7
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940124), vol. 018, no. 045, Database accession no. (P - 1681), & JP05273231 A 19931022 (TOYODA MACH WORKS LTD) [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [E]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 22, Database accession no. 96-212202, XP002016077 & JPH0875779 A 19960322 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [E] 1 * abstract *