EP0751718 - STABLE PRESERVATION METHOD OF POWDERED SOFT DRINK PREPARATION AND POWDERED SOFT DRINK PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kanda-Tsukasacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kanda-Tsukasacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAICHI, Akihisa 172-3, Aza Nakajima Takashima Narutocho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Toshihiko 632, Ko Kokufucho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 772 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Tetsuo Mezon-Kitahama 401 21-9, Aza Miyanohigashi Kitahama, Muyacho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772 / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96900735.0 | 22.01.1996 | [1997/02] | WO1996JP00109 | Priority number, date | JP19950028804 | 24.01.1995 Original published format: JP 2880495 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622704 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751718 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751718 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/44, A23L2/39 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
A23L2/39 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/44 (EP,KR,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/02] | Title | German: | STABILES KONSERVIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGE NICHTALKOHOLISCHE GETRÄNKENZUBEREITUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNG VON PULVERFÖRMIGER NICHTALKOHOLISCHER GETRÄNKENZUBEREITUNGEN | [2000/47] | English: | STABLE PRESERVATION METHOD OF POWDERED SOFT DRINK PREPARATION AND POWDERED SOFT DRINK PREPARATION | [1997/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRESERVATION STABLE DE PREPARATIONS EN POUDRE POUR BOISSON NON ALCOOLISEE ET PREPARATION PULVERULENTE POUR BOISSON NON ALCOOLISEE | [1997/02] |
Former [1997/02] | STABIELES KONSERVIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PULVERFORMIGE NICHTALKOHOLISCHE GETRANKENZUBEREITUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNG VON PULVERFORMIGER NICHTALKOHOLISCHER GETRANKENZUBEREITUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2183808 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 11-17 *; | [A]US4278695 (VELASCO VIOLETA S) [A] 1,4 * column 2, lines 14-24; example .; claim . *; | [A]JPS58170464 ; | [A]JPH02164536 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 46, Database accession no. 83-817418, XP002002267 & JPS58170464 A 00000000 (NISSAN) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 31, Database accession no. 90-236040, XP002002268 & JPH02164536 A 00000000 (ASAHI) [A] 1 * abstract * |