blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0809905

EP0809905 - ENCODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/12]
Former [1997/49]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / REINER, Robert
Säulenstrasse 2
D-82008 Unterhaching / DE
[1997/49]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2004/04]Epping, Hermann, Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2001/19]Fischer, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2001/12]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date96900841.623.01.1996
[1997/49]
WO1996DE00094
Priority number, dateDE199510509715.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19505097
[1997/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9625813
Date:22.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0809905
Date:03.12.1997
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0809905
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/18
[1997/49]
CPC:
G06K19/07363 (EP,US); H04L9/065 (EP,KR,US); H04L9/002 (EP,US);
G06F2207/7219 (EP,US); H04L2209/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/49]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG[1997/49]
English:ENCODING DEVICE[1997/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE[1997/49]
Entry into regional phase06.08.1997National basic fee paid 
06.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
09.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2002Fee for grant paid
22.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0314148  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 20 * * column 2, line 34 - line 45 * * column 4, line 15 - line 25 * * column 5, line 26 - line 43 ** column 7, line 1 - line 18 *;
 [A]EP0384478  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 12; figures 2,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.