16.04.2010 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
20.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
05.08.2005 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Interlocutory revision of appeal |
|
10.06.2005 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
23.05.2005 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
01.04.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
11.03.2005 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.01.2005 |
Appeal number |
|
04.12.2002 |
Change - appeal |
|
21.09.2002 |
Change - appeal |
|
30.07.2002 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
30.07.2002 |
Opposition rejected |
|
19.07.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
13.07.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
18.12.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
09.07.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
26.02.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
02.02.2001 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
27.01.2001 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
10.03.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] |
11.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.02.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
01.10.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.05.1998 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] |
26.09.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] |
05.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|