Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0805831

EP0805831 - Use of toluenediamine initiated propyleneoxide polyols in rigid polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/46]NOVEL POLYETHER POLYOLS, POLYOL FORMULATION CONTAINING THEM AND THEIR USE IN THE PRODUCTION OF HARD POLYURETHANE FOAMS
[1999/13]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [1997/46]For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DIETRICH, Karl-Werner
Am Thelen Siefen 8
D-51519 Odenthal / DE
02 / DIETRICH, Manfred
Dresdener Strasse 16
D-51373 Leverkusen / DE
03 / LAMBERTS, Wilhelm
Rua Baru, 46 Jardim Cordeiro
04639-030 S o Paulo, SP / BR
04 / KLÄN, Walter
August-Kekulé-Strasse 12
D-51373 Leverkusen / DE
[1997/46]
Application number, filing date96900954.715.01.1996
[1997/46]
WO1996EP00140
Priority number, dateDE199510257827.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19502578
[1997/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9623017
Date:01.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0805831
Date:12.11.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805831
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/48, C08G18/50, C08J9/14
[1997/46]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/46]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Toluylendiamin gestarteten Propylenoxid Polyolen in Polyurethan Hartschaumstoffen[1999/13]
English:Use of toluenediamine initiated propyleneoxide polyols in rigid polyurethane foams[1999/13]
French:Utilisation de polyols en base de toluenediamine oxide de propylene dans mousses de polyurethane rigides[1999/13]
Former [1997/46]NEUE POLYETHERPOLYOLE, POLYOLFORMULIERUNG ENTHALTEND DIESE POLYETHERPOLYOLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HARTEN POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFFEN
Former [1997/46]NOVEL POLYETHER POLYOLS, POLYOL FORMULATION CONTAINING THEM AND THEIR USE IN THE PRODUCTION OF HARD POLYURETHANE FOAMS
Former [1997/46]NOUVEAUX POLYETHERS-POLYOLS, FORMULATION DE POLYOLS RENFERMANT CES POLYETHERS-POLYOLS ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MOUSSES DE POLYURETHANNE DURES
Entry into regional phase27.08.1997National basic fee paid 
27.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
25.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.05.2005Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2001   
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Swinnen, Anne-Marie
Huntsman ICI (Europe) BVBA
Huntsman Polyurethanes
Intellectual Property Dept.
Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/12]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2001   
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Swinnen, Anne-Marie
Huntsman ICI (Europe) BVBA, Huntsman Polyurethanes, Intellectual Property Dept., Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
01.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.09.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
02.08.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.08.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
08.06.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/38]
Appeal following opposition17.09.2002Appeal received No.  T0953/02
29.11.2002Statement of grounds filed
04.08.2005Interlocutory revision of appeal
04.08.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
08.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB15.01.2005
[2010/20]
Former [2007/34]GB15.01.2005
IT15.01.2005
Former [2006/13]GB15.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US5260347  (KRUEGER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 2, line 24 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 12 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 16 * * examples 11-24 * * claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0495134  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 32 - page 4, line 36 * * table 1 * * claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0293060  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 39 - page 1, line 48 * * page 4, line 6 - page 4, line 11 * * table 1 *;
 [A]EP0374628  (MOBAY CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 32 - page 2, line 40 * * page 3, line 37 - page 3, line 43 *
otherWO9403515
 US4391728