Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0757113

EP0757113 - HIGH-STRENGTH LINE-PIPE STEEL HAVING LOW YIELD RATIO AND EXCELLENT LOW-TEMPERATURE TOUGHNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/06]For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAMEHIRO, Hiroshi, Nippon Steel Corporation
Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi
Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP
02 / ASAHI, Hitoshi, Nippon Steel Corporation
Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi
Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP
03 / HARA, Takuya, Nippon Steel Corporation
Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi
Futtsu City, Chiba 299-12 / JP
04 / TERADA, Yoshio Nippon Steel Corporation
Kimitsu Works 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu City
Chiba 299-11 / JP
[1997/06]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1997/06]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date96901131.126.01.1996
[1997/06]
WO1996JP00157
Priority number, dateJP1995001730203.02.1995         Original published format: JP 1730295
JP1995001830806.02.1995         Original published format: JP 1830895
JP1995007272430.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7272495
JP1995007272530.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7272595
JP1995007272630.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7272695
JP1995019535831.07.1995         Original published format: JP 19535895
[1997/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9623909
Date:08.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0757113
Date:05.02.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996
[1997/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0757113
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/14, C22C38/32, C22C38/58, C22C38/04, C22C38/08, C22C38/12
[1998/19]
Former International [1997/06]C22C38/14, C22C38/32, C22C38/58
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/06]
TitleGerman:Hochfester Leitungsrohrstahl mit niedrigem Streckgrenze-Zugfestigkeit-Verhältnis und ausgezeichneter Tieftemperaturzähigkeit[1999/45]
English:HIGH-STRENGTH LINE-PIPE STEEL HAVING LOW YIELD RATIO AND EXCELLENT LOW-TEMPERATURE TOUGHNESS[1997/06]
French:ACIER DE CANALISATION EXTREMEMENT RESISTANT POSSEDANT UN RAPPORT D'ECOULEMENT PEU ELEVE ET UNE EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE A BASSE TEMPERATURE[1997/06]
Former [1997/06]HOCHFESTER PIPELINESTAHL MIT NIEDRIGER STRECKGRENZE UND HERVORRAGENDER TIEFTEMPERATURZÄHIGKEIT
Entry into regional phase31.10.1996Translation filed 
31.10.1996National basic fee paid 
31.10.1996Search fee paid 
31.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/06]
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
24.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2000Fee for grant paid
04.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0152160  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 *see examples and claims*;
 [A]EP0080809  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 *see examples and claims*;
 [A]JPS60181229  ;
 [A]JPS59190323  ;
 [A]JPS5983722  ;
 [A]JPS5834131
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860204), vol. 010, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 326), & JP60181229 A 19850914 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850226), vol. 009, no. 045, Database accession no. (C - 268), & JP59190323 A 19841029 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840828), vol. 008, no. 187, Database accession no. (C - 240), & JP59083722 A 19840515 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830518), vol. 007, no. 114, Database accession no. (C - 166), & JP58034131 A 19830228 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH05195057  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO);
 [A]JPH02217417  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO);
 [A]JPH02125843  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO);
 [A]JPS63118012  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [A]JPS5983722  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO)