Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0776421

EP0776421 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003Revocation of patentpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1997/23]
Inventor(s)01 / EGLER, Walter
Thaerstrasse 36
D-70499 Stuttgart / DE
02 / BÖHLAND, Peter
Forellenweg 3
D-71711 Steinheim / DE
[1997/23]
Application number, filing date96901228.502.02.1996
[1997/23]
WO1996DE00161
Priority number, dateDE1995202829U21.02.1995         Original published format: DE 29502829 U
[1997/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9626362
Date:29.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0776421
Date:04.06.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996
[1997/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0776421
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP29.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:F02M55/02, F02M63/02, F02M63/00
[1997/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/23]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZEINRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN[1997/23]
English:FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES[1997/23]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE[1997/23]
Entry into regional phase21.11.1996National basic fee paid 
21.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
03.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.1999Fee for grant paid
16.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.02.2001  12.03.2001  ADMISSIBLE
L'Orange Gmbh
Porschestrasse 30
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Winter, Josef
MTU Friedrichshafen GmbH
Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/18]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2001  12.03.2001  ADMISSIBLE
L'Orange Gmbh
Porschestrasse 30
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Winter, Josef
MTU Motoren- und Turbinen-Union Friedrichshafen GmbH Patentabteilung ZJXP
88040 Friedrichshafen / DE
02.04.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
24.09.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/17]
18.11.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PDA]DE4414242  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PDA] 1 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 48; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0531533  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 52 - column 9, line 36; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]GB2045863  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * abstract *