Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0808302

EP0808302 - 2-ARYL-2-ALKYL-OMEGA-ALKYLAMINOALKANE NITRILE RACEMATE SEPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KARL, Ulrich
Grünerstrasse 7
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / SEITZ, Werner
Bismarckstrasse 22b
D-68723 Plankstadt / DE
[1997/48]
Application number, filing date96901746.620.01.1996
[1997/48]
WO1996EP00236
Priority number, dateDE199510296731.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19502967
[1997/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9623764
Date:08.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808302
Date:26.11.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808302
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C253/34, C07C255/43
[1997/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RACEMATTRENNUNG VON 2-ARYL-2-ALKYL-OMEGA-ALKYLAMINO-ALKANNITRILEN[1997/48]
English:2-ARYL-2-ALKYL-OMEGA-ALKYLAMINOALKANE NITRILE RACEMATE SEPARATION PROCESS[1997/48]
French:PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE RACEMATES DE NITRILES DE 2-ARYL-2-ALKYL-OMEGA-ALKYLAMINOALCANES[1997/48]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1997National basic fee paid 
03.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
29.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1999Fee for grant paid
27.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE2059985  (KNOLL AG) [AD] 1 * page 8 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0357565  (MINI RICERCA SCIENT TECNOLOG [IT]) [A] 1 * examples 5,6; claim 1 *;
 [PA]WO9509150  (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1 * page 3, line 3 - line 8 * * page 3, line 31 - line 36; example C *