EP0757021 - SCRATCH-RESISTANT GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEHGAL, Jeetendra Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 02 /
KASE, Junichiro Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA, Akira Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideo Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 05 /
NAKAO, Yasumasa Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | 06 /
ITO, Seturo Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221 / JP | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/06] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96901989.2 | 13.02.1996 | [1997/06] | WO1996JP00301 | Priority number, date | JP19950023126 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: JP 2312695 | JP19950139692 | 06.06.1995 Original published format: JP 13969295 | JP19950140893 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14089395 | JP19950143472 | 09.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14347295 | JP19950219070 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21907095 | [1997/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9624560 | Date: | 15.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757021 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757021 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/091, C03C3/089, C03C3/093 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
C03C3/078 (EP,US);
C03C3/087 (KR);
C03C3/085 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
C03C3/091 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/06] | C03C3/091 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/06] | Title | German: | KRATZFESTES GLAS | [1997/06] | English: | SCRATCH-RESISTANT GLASS | [1997/06] | French: | VERRE RESISTANT A LA RAYURE | [1997/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1996 | Translation filed | 04.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.04.2001 | IT | 25.04.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/12] | BE | 25.04.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3811853 (BARTHOLOMEW R, et al) [XD] 1 * example 1; table 1 *; | [X]US2224493 (TAYLOR WILLIAM C) [X] 1 * example G; table II *; | [X]GB319337 (CORNING GLASS WORKS) [X] 1 * page 3; example VI * | International search | [Y]JPS5192811 ; | [A]JPS62270439 (ISHIZUKA GLASS); | [A]JPS5659642 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK, et al) |