Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0833993

EP0833993 - A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS AND SPATIAL STRUCTURE WITH SUCH COUPLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bertels, Augustinus Wilhelmus Maria
Utrechtseweg 437
6865 CL Doorwerth / NL
[1998/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/15]
Representative(s)'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2005/10]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [1998/15]Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date96902490.011.01.1996
[1998/15]
WO1996NL00023
Priority number, dateNL1995000007213.01.1995         Original published format: NL 9500072
[1998/15]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9621781
Date:18.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0833993
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996
[1998/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:E04C5/04, E04C5/16
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/15]
TitleGerman:KUPPLUNG ZWISCHEN KONSTRUKTIONSELEMENTEN UND RÄUMLICHE KONSTRUKTION MIT SOLCHER KUPPLUNG[1998/15]
English:A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS AND SPATIAL STRUCTURE WITH SUCH COUPLINGS[1998/15]
French:ACCOUPLEMENT ENTRE DEUX ELEMENTS DE STRUCTURE, ET STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE COMPORTANT DES ACCOUPLEMENTS DE CE TYPE[1998/15]
Entry into regional phase18.07.1996Translation filed 
13.08.1997National basic fee paid 
13.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.1997Examination requested  [1998/15]
16.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/06]
10.01.2003Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/06]
Appeal following examination08.08.2003Appeal received No.  T0032/04
24.10.2003Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
27.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.02.199803   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1998
31.01.200005   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200207   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200308   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200409   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200510   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1341305  (BAU-STAHLGEWEBE) [X] 1-5 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0136283  (BEST-BAUEISEN- UND STAHL-BEARBEITUNGSGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 6 - page 7, line 15 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 10 * * page 13, line 37 - page 14, line 24 * * figures 6-9,37-43,52 *;
 [A]DE3513235  (BUCHER) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *