Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0833993 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0833993



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 209
11.01.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.01.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.12.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
19.12.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 9
08.11.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
26.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 2
01.06.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.05.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.05.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
13.05.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.04.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.03.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.01.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.01.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
26.05.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.03.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
26.01.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
11.12.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.12.2003 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
24.10.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
08.08.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.06.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.06.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2003 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
16.06.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
16.06.2003 Means of redress Search / examination 1
10.06.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.03.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
30.01.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.01.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.01.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
09.01.2003 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.01.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
08.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.01.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.01.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.11.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.10.2002 Urgent letter Search / examination 1
10.10.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.01.2002 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
22.01.2002 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
12.11.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
10.09.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 5
12.07.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
17.04.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 6
23.03.2001 Annex to a communication Search / examination 15
23.03.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
23.01.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
16.01.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
10.11.2000 Annex Search / examination 2
10.11.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 4
30.08.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
27.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 2
15.02.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.08.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.02.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 8
13.08.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.04.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
28.04.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
05.09.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.07.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.07.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34
18.07.1996 Priority document Search / examination 14