Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0770125

EP0770125 - PRIMATE EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 North Walnut Street Post Office Box 7365
Madison, WI 53707-7365 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 North Walnut Street Post Office Box 7365
Madison Wisconsin 53707-7365 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMSON, James A.
2541 Fiedler Lane 3
Madison, WI 53713 / US
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Duckworth, Timothy John
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [1997/18]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96903521.119.01.1996
[1997/18]
WO1996US00596
Priority number, dateUS1995037632720.01.1995         Original published format: US 376327
[1997/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9622362
Date:25.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0770125
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996
[1997/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.07.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, C12N5/06
[1997/52]
Former International [1997/18]C12N5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/18]
TitleGerman:STAMMZELLEN AUS PRIMATENEMBRYONEN[1997/18]
English:PRIMATE EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS[1997/18]
French:CELLULES SOUCHES EMBRYONNAIRES DE PRIMATES[1997/18]
Entry into regional phase14.11.1996National basic fee paid 
14.11.1996Search fee paid 
14.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/18]
17.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/41]
13.07.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.04.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/41]
15.05.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal  [2009/46]
25.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/46]
Appeal following examination06.09.2004Appeal received No.  T1374/04
19.11.2004Statement of grounds filed
25.07.2009Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
24.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP05024871.5  / EP1640448
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5453357  (HOGAN BRIGID L M [US]) [PX] 9-11 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  THOMSON J A ET AL, "ISOLATION OF A PRIMATE EMBRYONIC STEM CELL LINE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (199508), vol. 92, no. 17, pages 7844 - 7848, XP000604992 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.17.7844
International search[X]  THE MILWAUKEE JOURNAL, issued 04 November 1994, "Embryonic Monkey Cells Isolated"
 [X]  THERIOGENOLOGY, Volume 41, issued 1994, BONGSO et al., "The Growth of Inner Cell Mass Cells from Human Blastocysts", page 167
 [X]  HUMAN REPRODUCTION, Volume 9, No. 11, issued 1994, BONGSO et al., "Isolation and Culture of Inner Cell Mass Cells from Human Blastocysts", pages 2110-2117
 [Y]  THERIOGENOLOGY, Volume 34, No. 5, issued November 1990, PIEDRAHITA et al., "On the Isolation of Embryonic Stem Cells: Comparative Behavior of Murine, Porcine and Ovine Embryos", pages 879-901