Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0811202

EP0811202 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE LOCATION OF AN IMAGE TARGET REGION FROM TRACKED MULTIPLE IMAGE LANDMARK REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HANNA, Keith, James
212 John Street
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / KUMAR, Rakesh
64 Woodland Way
Dayton, NJ 08810 / US
[1997/50]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/50]Pratt, Richard Wilson
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96903561.730.01.1996
[1997/50]
WO1996US00720
Priority number, dateUS1995038048430.01.1995         Original published format: US 380484
[1997/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9624113
Date:08.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0811202
Date:10.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996
[1997/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0811202
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search reportUS08.08.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, H04N5/225
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHÄTZEN DER LAGE EINER BILD-ZIELREGION AUS MEHREREN REGIONEN MITVERFOLGTER LANDMARKEN[2002/19]
English:METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE LOCATION OF AN IMAGE TARGET REGION FROM TRACKED MULTIPLE IMAGE LANDMARK REGIONS[1997/50]
French:PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DE L'EMPLACEMENT D'UNE REGION-CIBLE D'UNE IMAGE A PARTIR DE REGIONS-REPERES RECHERCHEES A IMAGES MULTIPLES[1997/50]
Former [1997/50]VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHÄTZEN DER LAGE EINER BILD-ZIELREGION AUS MEHREREN MITVERFOLGTEN BILD-MARKSTEINREGIONEN
Entry into regional phase19.08.1997National basic fee paid 
19.08.1997Search fee paid 
19.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/50]
09.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2002Fee for grant paid
19.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9306691  (SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]) [AD] 1 * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 25; figure 6 *
International search[Y]US5144685  (NASAR HATEM N [US], et al);
 [Y]US5034986  (KARMANN KLAUS-PETER [DE], et al);
 [Y]US5264933  (ROSSER ROY J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5353392  (LUQUET ANDRE [FR], et al);
 [Y]US4539585  (SPACKOVA DANIELA S [US], et al)