EP0804265 - INSTRUCTION FOR PLAYING HOCKEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macri, Vincent J. 5 Timber Brook Lane Durham, NH 03824 / US | For all designated states Zilber, Paul 38 Melony Avenue Plainview, NY 11803 / US | For all designated states Magaw, Robert O. Two Langdon Road Carle Place New York 11514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states Macri, Vincent J. 5 Timber Brook Lane Durham, NH 03824 / US | ||
For all designated states Zilber, Paul 38 Melony Avenue Plainview, NY 11803 / US | |||
For all designated states Magaw, Robert O. Two Langdon Road Carle Place, New York 11514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96903642.5 | 22.01.1996 | [1997/45] | WO1996US00919 | Priority number, date | US19950375606 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375606 | US19950375616 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375616 | US19950375617 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375617 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9622134 | Date: | 25.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0804265 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804265 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A63B24/0003 (EP);
A63B24/0006 (EP);
A63B24/0021 (EP);
A63B69/00 (EP);
A63B69/0026 (EP);
G09B19/0038 (EP);
A63B2024/0012 (EP);
A63B2024/0025 (EP);
A63B2071/0647 (EP);
A63B2220/17 (EP);
A63B2220/53 (EP);
A63B2220/806 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | AUSBILDUNG ZUM HOCKEYSPIELEN | [1997/45] | English: | INSTRUCTION FOR PLAYING HOCKEY | [1997/45] | French: | FORMATION AU HOCKEY SUR GLACE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Request for further processing for: | 17.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2000 | Decision despatched | 31.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 14.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2000 | FR | 05.04.2000 | NL | 05.04.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 01.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
FR | 01.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 05.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2153384 (JOSEPH MAZZA) [A] 4,10 * page 1, column 2, line 10 - page 2, column 1, line 14 * * figure - *; | [X]US3408750 (MCCOLLOUGH GEORGE T, et al) [X] 33,39 * column 3, line 36 - line 69 * * figure - *; | [A]US4688792 (RIVKIN EFIM [US]) [A] 4 * column 3, line 47 - line 53 *; | [X]US4752764 (PETERSON DEAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 1,6 *; | [Y]US4805631 (ROI DU MAROC II SA MAJESTE H [MA]) [Y] 3,18 * column 1, line 28 - line 65 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4891748 (MANN RALPH V [US]) [X] 33-35,37,39,40 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 19 * * column 7, line 44 - line 46 * * column 12, line 34 - column 13, line 25 * * column 14, line 1 - line 55 * * column 34, line 22 - column 35, line 12 *; | [X]WO9004848 (STRONG SIMON DAVID [GB]) [X] 33,37,39 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 28 *; | [A]US4941660 (WINN DONALD G [US], et al) [A] 4,7-9,14 * column 1, line 34 - line 46 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 13 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US5249967 (O'LEARY GEORGE P [US], et al) [X] 33,34,39 * column 3, line 5 - line 40 ** figure - *; | [X]US5363297 (LARSON NOBLE G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16-18 * column 1, line 7 - line 24 * * column 1, line 40 - line 46 * * column 3, line 12 - line 15 * * column 3, line 36 - line 66 * * figure - *; | [XY] - OKUI M ET AL, "LOCUS DISPLAY OF MOVING SPORTS PLAYERS", SMPTE JOURNAL, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (198707), vol. 96, no. 7, pages 667 - 673, XP000001305 [X] 1,2,16 * page 667, paragraph ABSTRACT * * page 667, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 667, column 3, paragraph 2 - page 669, column 1, line 3 * [Y] 3,18 |