Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0808117

EP0808117 - ROCKER STOOL WITH CONTACT MEANS CENTRALLY ARRANGED BELOW THE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glöckl, Josef
Ammerseestrasse 6
85551 Kirchheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
GLÖCKL, Josef
Ammerseestrasse 6
85551 Kirchheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Reinhardt, Markus , et al
Reinhardt & Söllner
Patentanwälte
P.O. Box 1226
85542 Kirchheim bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Reinhardt, Markus , et al
Reinhardt & Söllner, Patentanwälte, P.O. Box 1226
85542 Kirchheim bei München / DE
Former [1997/48]Sperling, Rüdiger, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. S. Staeger, Dipl.Ing.Dipl.Wirtsch.Ing. R. Sperling, Müllerstrasse 31
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date96903948.630.01.1996
[1997/48]
WO1996EP00376
Priority number, dateDE199510412108.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19504121
[1997/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9624274
Date:15.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808117
Date:26.11.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808117
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:A47C9/02
[1997/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/25]
Former [1997/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:PENDELHOCKER MIT ZENTRAL UNTER DER SITZFLÄCHE ANGEORDNETER KONTAKTEINRICHTUNG[1997/48]
English:ROCKER STOOL WITH CONTACT MEANS CENTRALLY ARRANGED BELOW THE SEAT[1997/48]
French:TABOURET A BASCULE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE CONTACT SITUE AU-DESSOUS DU CENTRE DU SIEGE[1997/48]
Entry into regional phase29.08.1997National basic fee paid 
29.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
09.09.1997Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU, PT
08.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2000Fee for grant paid
27.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.02.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES13.09.2000
IT13.09.2000
NL13.09.2000
DK13.12.2000
SE13.12.2000
AT30.01.2001
BE31.01.2001
CH31.01.2001
LI31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2003/46]ES13.09.2000
NL13.09.2000
DK13.12.2000
SE13.12.2000
AT30.01.2001
BE31.01.2001
CH31.01.2001
LI31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
Former [2003/09]ES13.09.2000
NL13.09.2000
SE13.12.2000
AT30.01.2001
BE31.01.2001
CH31.01.2001
LI31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
Former [2002/27]ES13.09.2000
SE13.12.2000
BE31.01.2001
CH31.01.2001
LI31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
Former [2002/15]SE13.12.2000
BE31.01.2001
CH31.01.2001
LI31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
Former [2002/12]SE13.12.2000
BE31.01.2001
IE19.04.2001
Former [2002/10]SE13.12.2000
IE19.04.2001
Former [2001/50]IE13.09.2000
SE13.12.2000
Former [2001/27]SE13.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9319645  (GLOECKL JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4210099  (GLOECKL JOSEF [DE]);
 [A]DE3207941  (RAU SIEGFRIED)