Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0809852

EP0809852 - GAS-PERMEABLE HIGH-VOLTAGE INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 2
80539 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAUER, Felix
Nordendstrasse 57
D-80801 München / DE
[1997/49]
Representative(s)Hertz, Oliver , et al
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]Hertz, Oliver , et al
v. Bezold & Partner, Brienner Strasse 52
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date96904049.209.02.1996
[1997/49]
WO1996EP00559
Priority number, dateDE199510485714.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19504857
[1997/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9625751
Date:22.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0809852
Date:03.12.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996
[1997/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0809852
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01F6/06, H02G15/34
[1997/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/49]
TitleGerman:GASDURCHLÄSSIGE HOCHSPANNUNGSISOLATION[1997/49]
English:GAS-PERMEABLE HIGH-VOLTAGE INSULATION[1997/49]
French:ISOLATION HAUTE TENSION PERMEABLE AUX GAZ[1997/49]
Entry into regional phase16.07.1997National basic fee paid 
16.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0464498  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,6 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 4; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]JPS60200579  ;
 [A]EP0596249  (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,3,6 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 7; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860222), vol. 10, no. 46, Database accession no. (E - 383)<2103> , [A] 1,3,6 * abstract *