Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019547

EP1019547 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING AN ORGANIC COMPOUND FROM SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danisco Sweeteners Oy
Keilaranta 9
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/16]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
XYROFIN OY
Kyllikinportti 2
00240 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / NURMI, Juha
Vasarasepäntie 4 D 6
FIN-10330 Pinjainen / FI
02 / EROMA, Olli-Pekka
Merikatu 8
FIN-48100 Kotka / FI
03 / ERIKSSON, Kristian
Uudentuvankatu 6 A 14
FIN-20740 Turku / FI
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Puranen, Maija-Liisa , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Puranen, Maija-Liisa , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/29]Nuotio, Irja Elina , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date96904108.601.03.1996
[2000/29]
WO1996FI00124
Priority number, dateFI1995000095701.03.1995         Original published format: FI 950957
FI1995000206528.04.1995         Original published format: FI 952065
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9627029
Date:06.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019547
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019547
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:C13K13/00, C13F1/02, B01D9/02
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
Extension statesLT12.09.1997
LV12.09.1997
SI12.09.1997
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RUECKGEWINNUNG EINER ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG AUS LOESUNGEN[2000/29]
English:METHOD FOR RECOVERING AN ORGANIC COMPOUND FROM SOLUTIONS[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'UN COMPOSE ORGANIQUE CONTENU DANS DES SOLUTIONS[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase12.09.1997National basic fee paid 
12.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.09.1997Examination requested  [2000/29]
06.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2001Fee for grant paid
24.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
GR02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
IE01.03.2002
LU01.03.2002
MC01.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2003/46]BE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
GR02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
IE01.03.2002
MC01.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2003/25]BE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
GR02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
IE01.03.2002
MC01.03.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2003/19]BE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
GR02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
IE01.03.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2003/17]BE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
IE01.03.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2003/06]BE02.01.2002
CH02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
PT02.04.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2003/01]CH02.01.2002
LI02.01.2002
NL02.01.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2002/48]NL02.01.2002
SE02.04.2002
Former [2002/37]SE02.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1342126  (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP)
 [X]  - WARREN L. McCABE et al., "Unit Operations of Chemical Engineering", Second Edition, 1967, McGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, NEW YORK, pages 756-764.