Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0815341


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.10.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
11.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
02.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
26.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2001 [2001/11]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
23.02.2000 Renewal fee
27.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
20.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
19.02.1999 Renewal fee
18.02.1999 Examination report or reply
17.12.1998 Examination report or reply
14.08.1998 First examination report
10.08.1998 Examination report or reply
19.02.1998 Renewal fee
21.11.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.1998 [1998/02]
21.11.1997 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.1998 [1998/02]
06.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
23.10.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
18.04.1996 PCT data prior to European publication