Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0815341
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0815341Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0815341 07.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU712175B 28.10.1999B2
AU4837096 02.10.1996A
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9607222 07.07.1998A
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2214877 15.06.2004C
CA2214877 19.09.1996A1
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69607949D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69607949T 28.12.2000T2
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0815341T 25.09.2000T3
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO316708B 13.04.2004B1
NO974208L 14.11.1997L
NO974208D 12.09.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5960885 05.10.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9600435 27.02.1996
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9628634Global Dossier 19.09.1996A1
Priority number Date
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2144728T 16.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
GB9505129 14.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9505129D 03.05.1995D0
Priority number Date
GB9505129 14.03.1995