Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0815341

EP0815341 - DUAL BORE RISER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Expro North Sea Limited
Kirkhill Place, Kirkhill Industrial Estate Dyce
Aberdeen AB2 OES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
EXPRO NORTH SEA LIMITED
Kirkhill Place, Kirkhill Industrial Estate
Dyce, Aberdeen AB2 OES / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MORGAN, Michael, Graham
Linganbo Farm House
King Edward, Banff AB4 3NS / GB
02 / EDWARDS, Jeffrey, Charles
East Woodlands, Kinaldie
Dyce, Aberdeen AB2 0HD / GB
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Naismith, Robert Stewart
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]Naismith, Robert Stewart
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date96904176.327.02.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996GB00435
Priority number, dateGB1995000512914.03.1995         Original published format: GB 9505129
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628634
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815341
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0815341
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/01, E21B19/22
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/02]
TitleGerman:DOPPELTES BOHRLOCHSTEIGROHR[1998/02]
English:DUAL BORE RISER[1998/02]
French:SYSTEME DE FORAGE A DEUX COLONNES[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase28.08.1997National basic fee paid 
28.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
GR28.07.2000
[2004/51]
Former [2001/26]BE26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
Former [2001/16]BE26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
Former [2001/11]BE26.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US4770247  (R.L.WILKINS) [A] 1,7,13 * column W *;
 [A]US4059148  (SHELL) [A] 1,7,13 * column W *;
 [A]US4397357  (VETCO OFFSHORE) [A] 1,7,13 * column W *;
 [A]US3718183  (BYRON JACKSON INC.) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US5159982  (COOPER INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]GB2207936  (FOREX NEPTUNE);
 [A]US4529334  (EXXON);
 [A]US4934871  (ATLANTIC RIECHFIELD COMP.)
 [A]  - "CONCENTRIC DEEPWATER RISER GIVES OPERATORS NEW OPTIONS", WORLD OIL, HOUSTON TEXAS, (199502), vol. 216, no. 2, pages 99 - 100, XP000050353 [A] 1,7,13 * the whole document *