Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0810831

EP0810831 - A SURGICAL COAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mölnlycke Health Care AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Mölnlycke Health Care AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
Mölnlycke AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LÖFGREN, Kristina
Hönekullavägen 24
S-435 44 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / GILLGREN, Tomas
Pl 3560
S-430 41 Kullavik / SE
[1997/50]
Representative(s)Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Albihns.Zacco
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [1999/06]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606
182 16 Danderyd / SE
Former [1997/50]Hyltner, Jan-Olof , et al
Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date96904415.520.02.1996
[1997/50]
WO1996SE00222
Priority number, dateSE1995000063821.02.1995         Original published format: SE 9500638
[1997/50]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9625863
Date:29.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0810831
Date:10.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996
[1997/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0810831
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/12
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/50]
TitleGerman:OPERATIONSGEWAND[1997/50]
English:A SURGICAL COAT[1997/50]
French:BLOUSE CHIRURGICALE[1997/50]
Entry into regional phase29.08.1996Translation filed 
09.09.1997National basic fee paid 
09.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
09.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/50]
20.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2000Fee for grant paid
17.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
GR27.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
LU20.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
[2006/39]
Former [2004/51]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
GR27.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
LU20.02.2001
Former [2004/39]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
LU20.02.2001
Former [2003/46]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
Former [2003/09]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
Former [2002/14]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
IE20.02.2001
Former [2002/02]AT26.07.2000
CH26.07.2000
LI26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
Former [2001/18]AT26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
Former [2001/17]AT26.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1465122  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON);
 [A]EP0410438  (SOUSA PORTUGAL MANUEL DE [PT])