Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3327556B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2002 | B2 | JPH11511719 | 12.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9600314 | 29.01.1996 | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0805785 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2002 | B1 | EP0805785 | 12.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9600314 | 29.01.1996 | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2211875 | 02.10.2007 | C | CA2211875 | 01.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9600314 | 29.01.1996 | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69623930T | 15.05.2003 | T2 | DE69623930D1 | 31.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9600314 | 29.01.1996 | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100320630B | 02.07.2002 | B1 | KR19980701655 | 25.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9600314 | 29.01.1996 | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5958807 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | US87492697 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6017642 | 25.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 | US87817697 | 18.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9622949 | Global Dossier | 01.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37926695 | 27.01.1995 |