Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0805785

EP0805785 - LOW DIELECTRIC LOSS GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Former [1997/46]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Ananda, Hosakere
1296 Knollview Drive
Milpitas CA 95035 / US
02 / THALER, Barry, Jay
1 Chopin Lane
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
03 / PRABHU, Ashok, Narayan
21 Meadow Lane
East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US
04 / TORMEY, Ellen, Schwartz
8 Jeffrey Lane
Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US
[1998/14]
Former [1997/46]01 / KUMAR, Ananda, Hosakere
1907 Aspen Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
02 / THALER, Barry, Jay
1 Chopin Lane
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
03 / PRABHU, Ashok, Narayan
21 Meadow Lane
East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US
04 / TORMEY, Ellen, Schwartz
8 Jeffrey Lane
Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/46]Pratt, Richard Wilson
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96904444.529.01.1996
[1997/46]
WO1996US00314
Priority number, dateUS1995037926627.01.1995         Original published format: US 379266
[1997/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9622949
Date:01.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0805785
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805785
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C03C10/08
[1997/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [1997/46]
TitleGerman:GLÄSER MIT NIEDRIGEM DIELEKTRISCHEM VERLUST[1997/46]
English:LOW DIELECTRIC LOSS GLASSES[1997/46]
French:VERRES A FAIBLES PERTES DIELECTRIQUES[1997/46]
Entry into regional phase19.08.1997National basic fee paid 
19.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
14.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2002Fee for grant paid
15.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0351097  (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 41; table 1 *;
 [X]JPS62278145  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * examples G-11, G-13, G-22 *;
 [A]US4624934  (KOKUBU YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 5,8,15 * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 26 *;
    [] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880404), vol. 108, no. 14, Database accession no. 117521k, [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - S. H. KNICKERBOCKER ET AL., "Cordierite Glass-Ceramics for Multilayer Ceramic Packaging", AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, COLUMBUS US, (199301), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 90 - 95, XP000334303 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *