blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0802808

EP0802808 - APPARATUS FOR ALTERING COMPOSITION OF NUTRITIONAL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/44]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALTON, Joseph, Edward
86 Executive Court
Westerville, OH 43081 / US
02 / MAZER, Terrence, Bruce
6897 Roundelay Road North
Reynoldsburg, OH 43068 / US
03 / GECKLE, Ronita, Kay
2443 Shrewsbury Road
Columbus, OH 43221 / US
04 / PIONTEK, Carl, Joseph
118 Beech Ridge Drive
Powell, OH 43065 / US
05 / DUEL, Susan, Beth
12501 Dundee Circle
Laurinburg, NC 28352 / US
06 / DAAB-KRZYKOWSKI, Andre
35 West Jeffrey Place
Columbus, OH 43214 / US
07 / McCAMISH, Mark, Anthony
1084 Woodman Drive
Worthington, OH 43285 / US
08 / JOSEPH, Robert, Louis
3080 Somerford Road
Columbus, OH 43221 / US
09 / PIERSON, William, Guy
10297 Wright Road
Canal Winchester, OH 43110 / US
[1997/44]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/44]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date96904448.603.01.1996
[1997/44]
WO1996US00366
Priority number, dateUS1995037240713.01.1995         Original published format: US 372407
[1997/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9621480
Date:18.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0802808
Date:29.10.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802808
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.1996
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/00, A61M5/14, A61M31/00, A61J15/00
[1997/44]
CPC:
A61M31/002 (EP,US); A61J15/0026 (EP,US); A61J15/0069 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (EP,US); A61M5/1407 (EP,US); A61J15/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/44]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG EINES ERNÄHRUNGSPRODUKTES[1997/44]
English:APPARATUS FOR ALTERING COMPOSITION OF NUTRITIONAL PRODUCT[1997/44]
French:APPAREIL SERVANT A MODIFIER LA COMPOSITION D'UN PRODUIT NUTRITIONNEL[1997/44]
Entry into regional phase06.08.1997National basic fee paid 
06.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
13.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2003Fee for grant paid
06.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YD]US4511353  (THEEUWES FELIX [US]) [YD] 1-4,6-15,20-22,24-37 * column A * * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 62; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]EP0241595  (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-37 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO9115196  (ALZA CORP [US]) [Y] 17 * abstract *;
 [YD]US5069671  (THEEUWES FELIX [US]) [YD] 5,16,18,19,27,28 * column A; figures 1,4-9 *;
 [A]US5160742  (MAZER TERRENCE B [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9302558  (BIOGAIA BIOLOG AB [SE], et al) [Y] 23 * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 6 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 26 *
ExaminationUS3854480
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.