Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0809636

EP0809636 - SUBSTITUTED ISOXAZOLES FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D. Searle & Co.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
G.D. SEARLE & CO.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago, IL 60680-5110 / US
Former [1997/49]For all designated states
G.D. SEARLE & CO.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, Roland, S.
Deceased / US
02 / TALLEY, John, J.
8772 Pine Avenue
Brentwood, MO 63144 / US
03 / BROWN, David, L.
15504 Twingate
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
04 / NAGARAJAN, Srinivasan
16209 Forest Meadows Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US
05 / CARTER, Jeffery, S.
15321 Grantley Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
06 / WEIER, Richard, M.
240 Hickory Crescent
Lake Bluff, IL 60044 / US
07 / STEALEY, Michael, A.
502 Juniper Parkway
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
08 / COLLINS, Paul, W.
1557 Hawthorne Place
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
09 / SEIBERT, Karen
11930 Greenwalk Drive
St. Luis, MO 63146 / US
10 / GRANETO, Matthew, J.
1510 Voltaire Drive
St. Louis, MO 63146 / US
11 / XU, Xiangdong
Apartment 715 855 Hinman Avenue
Evanston, IL 60202 / US
12 / PARTIS, Richard
221 Noyes Street
Evnaston, IL 60201 / US
[1997/49]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1997/49]Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr.
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date96904614.312.02.1996
[1997/49]
WO1996US01869
Priority number, dateUS1995038768013.02.1995         Original published format: US 387680
US1995047388407.06.1995         Original published format: US 473884
[1997/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9625405
Date:22.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0809636
Date:03.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996
[1997/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0809636
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D261/08, C07D413/04, C07D261/18, C07D261/12, C07D261/10, A61K31/42
[1997/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/49]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE ISOXAZOLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNG[1997/49]
English:SUBSTITUTED ISOXAZOLES FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION[1997/49]
French:ISOXAZOLES SUBSTITUES UTILISABLES DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'INFLAMMATIONS[1997/49]
Entry into regional phase31.07.1997National basic fee paid 
31.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
20.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
17.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2002Fee for grant paid
04.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Appeal following examination16.10.2001Appeal received
12.12.2001Statement of grounds filed
20.02.2002Interlocutory revision of appeal
Divisional application(s)EP02003253.8  / EP1223167
EP05002668.1  / EP1528059
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9500501  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [DX] 1-6,17-23 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0633254  (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-4,17-23 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0026928  (CDC LIFE SCIENCES [CA]) [DA] 1-4,17-23 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0549797  (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-4,17-23 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0623603  (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,17-23 * claim - *