Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0759399

EP0759399 - PUNCHING METHOD FOR LAMINATED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/09]LAMINATED PEEL CONTAINER AND ASSOCIATED TECHNOLOGY
[2001/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
Former [1997/09]For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOMOTO, Tsugio
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd., 2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku, Tokyo 136 / JP
02 / GOTO, Takayuki
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd., 2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku, Tokyo 136 / JP
03 / YONEYAMA, Masashi
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd., 2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku, Tokyo 136 / JP
04 / SHIBANO, Yoshio, Tochigi Plant
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd., 1550, Hukiage-cho
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi 328-01 / JP
05 / AKIYAMA, Yoshio, Tochigi Plant
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd., 1550, Hukiage-cho
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi 328-01 / JP
[1997/09]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/09]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date96905010.306.03.1996
[1997/09]
WO1996JP00543
Priority number, dateJP1995008855810.03.1995         Original published format: JP 8855895
JP1995014010516.05.1995         Original published format: JP 14010595
JP1995017793622.06.1995         Original published format: JP 17793695
JP1995023203818.08.1995         Original published format: JP 23203895
JP1995023546313.09.1995         Original published format: JP 23546395
[1997/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628353
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0759399
Date:26.02.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1997/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0759399
Date:09.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/02]
Search report(s)International search reportJP19.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D1/02, B65D77/06, B65D83/76, B29C49/22, B05B11/00, B65D83/00, B65D23/02
[2000/03]
Former International [1997/09]B65D1/02, B65D77/06, B65D83/76, B29C49/22
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/09]
TitleGerman:STANZMETHODE BEI MEHRSCHICHTBEHÄLTER[2001/26]
English:PUNCHING METHOD FOR LAMINATED CONTAINER[2001/26]
French:METHODE DE POINCONNAGE DE RECIPIENT MULTICOUCHE[2001/26]
Former [1997/09]BEHÄLTER AUS LAMINIERTEM, LEICHT SCHÄLBAREM MATERIAL
Former [1997/09]LAMINATED PEEL CONTAINER AND ASSOCIATED TECHNOLOGY
Former [1997/09]RECIPIENT A PELLICULE LAMINEE ET TECHNIQUE CORRESPONDANTE
Entry into regional phase16.11.1996Translation filed 
29.11.1996National basic fee paid 
29.11.1996Search fee paid 
29.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
03.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2001Fee for grant paid
05.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00126071.0  / EP1092632
EP00126072.8  / EP1092633
EP02017205.2  / EP1266697
EP02017206.0  / EP1266698
Opposition(s)10.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH06505463
 [Y]JPH06345069
 [Y]JPH0471681U
 [A]JPH0627523U
 [YE]JPH0880929
 [Y]JPH06211243