Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0808406

EP0808406 - BREAKAWAY GUIDE ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLLER DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rite-Hite Holding Corporation
8900 N. Arbon Drive
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53223 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
RITE-HITE HOLDING Corporation
8900 N. Arbon Drive
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53223 / US
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
RITE-HITE CORPORATION
8900 North Arbon Drive
Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULTE, Peter, S.
10 Truman Drive
E. Dubuque, IL 60125 / US
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Niederkofler, Oswald , et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]Niederkofler, Oswald A. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1997/48]Beck, Jürgen , et al
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96905373.508.02.1996
[1997/48]
WO1996US01542
Priority number, dateUS1995038643610.02.1995         Original published format: US 386436
[1997/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9624741
Date:15.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808406
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808406
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.08.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/17, E06B9/58, E06B9/13
[1998/19]
Former International [1997/48]E06B9/17
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/48]
TitleGerman:TRENNBARE FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ROLLTOR[1997/48]
English:BREAKAWAY GUIDE ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLLER DOOR[1997/48]
French:ENSEMBLE GUIDE DE SEPARATION POUR PORTE-RIDEAU[1997/48]
Entry into regional phase09.09.1997National basic fee paid 
09.09.1997Search fee paid 
09.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
21.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
31.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2002Fee for grant paid
10.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02025557.6  / EP1288429
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.12.2002
ES27.06.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2004/04]ES27.06.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5271448  (DELGADO JOE M [US]);
 [X]US5139075  (DESROCHERS EDDY [CA]);
 [X]US5056579  (KRAFUTLER BERNARD [FR]);
 [A]US5025847  (MUELLER LOUIS B [US])