blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0898485

EP0898485 - CPR DEVICE HAVING STRUCTURE FOR INCREASING THE DURATION AND MAGNITUDE OF NEGATIVE INTRA-THORACIC PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Circulatory Systems Inc.
7615 Golden Triangle Drive, Suite A, Technology Park Nr. 5
Minneapolis, MN 55344 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc.
7615 Golden Triangle Drive, Suite A
Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344 / US
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
CPRX, LLC.
7615 Golden Triangle Drive, Suite A, Technology Park #5
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
CPRX, INC.
4751 Girard Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LURIE, Keith, G.
4751 Girard Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US
02 / SWEENEY, Michael
1525 Goodrich Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55105 / US
03 / GOLD, Barbara
4751 Girard Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Sanderson, Michael John, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Sanderson, Michael John, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96905523.516.02.1996
[1999/09]
WO1996US02097
Priority number, dateUS1995040300910.03.1995         Original published format: US 403009
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9628215
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0898485
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898485
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:A62B7/00, A62B9/02, A61M16/04, A61M16/20
[1999/09]
CPC data not yet available
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/09]
TitleGerman:HERZ-LUNGEN-WIEDERBELEBUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT DER MÖGLICHKEIT ZUM ERHÖHEN DER DAUER UND DES BETRAGES DES NEGATIVEN INNEREN THORAXDRUCKS[2002/22]
English:CPR DEVICE HAVING STRUCTURE FOR INCREASING THE DURATION AND MAGNITUDE OF NEGATIVE INTRA-THORACIC PRESSURE[1999/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REANIMATION CARDIO-PULMONAIRE A STRUCTURE AUGMENTANT LA DUREE ET L'INTENSITE D'UNE PRESSION INTRA-THORACIQUE NEGATIVE.[1999/09]
Former [1999/09]HERZ-LUNGEN-WIEDERBELEBUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT MÖGLICHKEITEN ZUM ERHÖHEN DER DAUER UND HÖHE DES NEGATIVEN INNEREN THOROXDRUCKS
Entry into regional phase26.09.1997National basic fee paid 
26.09.1997Search fee paid 
26.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.09.1997Examination requested  [1999/09]
02.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2002Fee for grant paid
25.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199803   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1998
29.02.200005   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0245142  (BOUSSIGNAC GEORGES ;LABRUNE JEAN CLAUDE (FR)) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 9, line 7 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]US3794043  (MCGINNIS G) [Y] 2 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 13 *;
 [YA]EP0367285  (AMBU INT AS) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 56 * [A] 6,13;
 [A]WO9321982  (UNIV NEW YORK) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 27 *;
 [A]US5305743  (BRAIN ARCHIBALD I J) [A] 5 * abstract * * column 4, line 16 - line 24 *;
 [PX]WO9528193  (BOESHERZ JAKOB ;BAUER HERIBERT (DE)) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [A]US4077404  (ELAM JAMES O) [A] 6,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 49 *;
 [A]US3933171  (HAY WAYNE W) [A] 6,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - line 68 *;
 [A]EP0139363  (O TWO SYSTEMS INT INC) [A] 6,13 * abstract * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 16 *;
 [A]  - MUSHIN W.W. ET AL., Automatic ventilatin of the lungs, OXFORD GB, BLASCKWELL SCIENTIFIC, (1980), 166160, XP002093879 [A] 6,13 * page 838; figures 95.23-95.24 *
International search[X]US4601465  (ROY JEAN-YVES [CA]);
 [Y]US5109840  (DALEIDEN JOHN P [US]);
 [Y]US4449526  (ELAM JAMES O [US]);
 [Y]US4881527  (LERMAN SAMUEL I [US])
by applicantUS5551420
 EP0509773
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.