Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807159

EP0807159 - AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING COBALT CHELATED CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GETTY, Edward, Eugene
8940 Roan Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
02 / SCHEPER, William, Michael
2393 Picnic Woods Drive
Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US
03 / GOLDSTEIN, Alan, Scott
4329 Berryhill Lane
Blue Ash, OH 45242 / US
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date96906217.330.01.1996
[1997/47]
WO1996US01198
Priority number, dateUS1995038275002.02.1995         Original published format: US 382750
[1997/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9623860
Date:08.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807159
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807159
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/39
[1997/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/47]
TitleGerman:MASCHINENGESCHIRRSPÜLMITTEL ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KOBALT CHELATKATALYSATOREN[1997/47]
English:AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING COBALT CHELATED CATALYSTS[1997/47]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR LAVE-VAISSELLES AUTOMATIQUES COMPRENANT DES CATALYSEURS CHELATES AU COBALT[1997/47]
Entry into regional phase17.07.1997National basic fee paid 
17.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
06.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2000Fee for grant paid
28.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Request for further processing for:21.12.1998Request for further processing filed
21.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.01.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
ES24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
DK24.08.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
GR25.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
LU30.01.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2004/39]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
ES24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
DK24.08.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
LU30.01.2001
Former [2003/46]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
ES24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
DK24.08.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
Former [2003/09]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
ES24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
Former [2002/27]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
ES24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
Former [2002/14]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
IE30.01.2001
Former [2002/02]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
CH24.05.2000
LI24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT24.05.2000
BE24.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0272030  (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [DX] 1,8-13 * page 7, line 54 - page 8, line 5; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0408131  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4088595  (MICHELSON ADOLF MICHAEL, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 3 - line 23; claim - *;
 [A]US3532634  (WOODS WILLIAM G) [A] 1,6 * claims 1,9,18 *;
 [PA]EP0677576  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document *
Examination US5246612
  US5244594