Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0815545

EP0815545 - ARTICLE OF MERCHANDISE WITH CONCEALED EAS MARKER AND EAS WARNING LOGO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
951 Yamato Road
Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
951 Yamato Road, P.O. Box 31 07 00
Boca Raton, FL 33431-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RYAN, Joseph, M., Jr.
802 North Atlantic Drive
Lantana, FL 33462 / US
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Hafner, Dieter
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. D. Hafner
Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys.
Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date96906232.202.02.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996US01281
Priority number, dateUS1995038357003.02.1995         Original published format: US 383570
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9624119
Date:08.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815545
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996
[1998/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.08.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/14
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1998/02]
TitleGerman:WARENARTIKEL MIT VERDECKTEM MARKIERUNGSETIKETT FÜR DIE WARENÜBERWACHUNG UND MARKIERUNGSETIKETT MIT WARNLOGO[1998/02]
English:ARTICLE OF MERCHANDISE WITH CONCEALED EAS MARKER AND EAS WARNING LOGO[1998/02]
French:ARTICLE DU COMMERCE MUNI DE MOUCHARD DE SURVEILLANCE ELECTRONIQUE D'ARTICLE OU DE LOGOTYPE DE SURVEILLANCE ELECTRONIQUE D'ARTICLE[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase19.07.1997National basic fee paid 
19.07.1997Search fee paid 
19.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.07.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
27.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5079541  (MOODY THOMAS O [US]);
 [Y]US4063229  (WELSH JOHN, et al);
 [Y]US4745401  (MONTEAN SAMUEL [US]);
 [Y]US4510489  (ANDERSON III PHILIP M [US], et al);
 [Y]US4660025  (HUMPHREY FLOYD B [US])