Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0809503

EP0809503 - METHOD OF LESSENING THE RISK OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]For all designated states
MERCK & CO., INC.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KARPF, David, B.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / CAPIZZI, Thomas, P.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / QUAN, Hui
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
04 / SANTORA, Arthur, C., II
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
05 / YATES, Ashley, J.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
[1997/49]
Representative(s)Hiscock, Ian James , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]Hiscock, Ian James , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date96906412.013.02.1996
[1997/49]
WO1996US01946
Priority number, dateUS1995038986017.02.1995         Original published format: US 389860
[1997/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9625166
Date:22.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0809503
Date:03.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996
[1997/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.08.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/66
[1997/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/52]
Former [1997/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER VERTEBRALEN BRUCHZUSSICHT[1997/49]
English:METHOD OF LESSENING THE RISK OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES[1997/49]
French:PROCEDE DE DIMINUTION DES RISQUES DE FRACTURES VERTEBRALES[1997/49]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1997National basic fee paid 
17.09.1997Search fee paid 
17.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
04.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/08]
18.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4761406  (FLORA LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1,15 *;
 [Y]WO9421266  (LEIRAS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-24 * page 5; claims 2,10 *;
 [XY]EP0600834  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 7-12 * page 2, lines 22,23 - line 53; claim 5 * [Y] 1-6,13-24;
 [X]  ADAMI, BARONI, BROGGINI ET AL., "Treatment of postmenopausal osteoporosis with continuous daily oral alendronate in comparison with either placebo or intranasal salmon calcitonin", OSTEOPOROSIS INT., (1993), vol. sup3, pages s21 - 27, XP002175823 [X] 1-24 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01623004
 [Y]  STORM, THAMSBORG, STEINICHE, "Effect of intermittent cyclical etinodrate therapy on bone mass and fracture rate in women with postmenopausal osteoporosis", N ENGL J MED, (1990), vol. 322, pages 1265 - 1271, XP002175824 [Y] 1-24 * page 1270, column 2, line 30-34 *; page 1265, column 2, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  FLEISCH, "The use of bisphosphonates in osteoporosis", BR. J. CLIN. PRACT., Berne, Switzerland, (199411), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 323 - 326, XP001012849 [A] 1-24 * page 325 *
International search[Y]US4621077  (ROSINI SERGIO [IT], et al)