Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0820368

EP0820368 - ELASTICALLY SUSPENDED BLADE SHAVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/05]SUSPENDED BLADE SHAVING SYSTEM
[2000/11]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
201 Tabor Road Morris Plains
NJ 07950 / US
[2006/38]
Former [2005/22]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FERRARO, Frank, Anthony
104 Garwood Road
Trumbull, CT 06611 / US
[1998/05]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/05]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Gate St. Mary's Court
Nottingham NG 1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date96906553.120.02.1996
[1998/05]
WO1996US02297
Priority number, dateUS1995041921610.04.1995         Original published format: US 419216
[1998/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9632233
Date:17.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0820368
Date:28.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996
[1998/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0820368
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0820368
Date:20.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/22
[1998/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/05]
TitleGerman:RASIERSYSTEM MIT ELASTISCH UNTERSTÜTZTEN KLINGEN[1998/05]
English:ELASTICALLY SUSPENDED BLADE SHAVING SYSTEM[2000/11]
French:SYSTEME DE RASAGE A LAMES SUSPENDUES ELASTIQUEMENT[2000/11]
Former [1998/05]SUSPENDED BLADE SHAVING SYSTEM
Former [1998/05]SYSTEME DE RASAGE A LAMES SUSPENDUES
Entry into regional phase12.09.1997National basic fee paid 
12.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
26.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2000Fee for grant paid
31.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.04.2001   
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02199-8004 / US
Opponent's representative
Görg, Klaus
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/25]
Opponent(s)01  26.04.2001   
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02199-8004 / US
Opponent's representative
Görg, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
05.06.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2002Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2002Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.01.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.03.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.04.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.07.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition10.09.2003Appeal received No.  T0886/03
30.10.2003Statement of grounds filed
26.01.2006Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
14.08.2003Appeal received
26.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR29.10.2004
[2005/19]
Cited inInternational search[X]US5347714  (PROCHASKA FRANK H [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 37; figures 2-6,8-10 *;
 [X]US4461079  (CIAFFONE JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * column W *;
 [X]EP0416233  (WILKINSON SWORD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * column W *;
 [X]EP0045879  (GILLETTE CO [US]) [X] 20-26,29-32 * column W *;
 [A]FR2457155  (GILLETTE CO [US]);
 [A]FR2379357  (GILLETTE CO [US]);
 [A]FR2406504  (GILLETTE CO [US])
OppositionUS1383783
 WO9310997
 US4586255
 US4069580