blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0813379


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.01.2003 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
22.01.2003 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
09.10.2002 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
04.10.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
13.09.2002 Change - applicant published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
13.09.2002 Change - representative published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
20.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
20.06.2002 Change - oral proceedings
22.01.2002 Change - oral proceedings
02.10.2001 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
06.06.2001 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
06.06.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
27.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
21.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
27.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  13.12.2000 [2000/50]
25.10.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
14.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.03.1999 Examination report or reply
03.03.1999 Renewal fee
30.10.1998 First examination report
27.10.1998 Examination report or reply
02.03.1998 Renewal fee
07.11.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.12.1997 [1997/52]
07.11.1997 Request for examination filed published on  29.12.1997 [1997/52]
17.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
19.10.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.1996 PCT data prior to European publication