blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0813379
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0813379Global Dossier 19.03.2003B2
EP0813379 19.01.2000B1
EP0813379 29.12.1997A2
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995
NO9600049 01.03.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69606283D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995
NO9600049 01.03.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69606283T 28.08.2003T3
DE69606283T 14.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995
NO9600049 01.03.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0813379T 22.04.2003T4
DK0813379T 08.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995
NO9600049 01.03.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9628071Global Dossier 19.09.1996A1
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO307641B 08.05.2000B2
NO307641B 08.05.2000B1
NO950924L 11.09.1996L
NO950924D 10.03.1995D0
Priority number Date
NO950924 10.03.1995