blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0813379

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 DK 
 FI 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure02.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase26.08.1997National basic fee paid 
26.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted19.01.2000
Opposition procedure08.01.2003Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.12.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):BE DE DK FI NL SE
 
Event date:29.12.1997 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19970826
 
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19981029
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE DK FI NL SE
 
Event date:24.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69606283
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000224
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:08.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:13.12.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SCAPA BEDDING AB
Effective DATE:20001017
 
Event date:01.02.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SCAPA BEDDING AB
 
Event date:30.10.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:STOKKE GRUPPEN AS
 
Event date:06.01.2003 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:STOKKE GRUPPEN AS
 
Event date:19.03.2003 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20030319
 
Event date:19.03.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE DK FI NL SE
 
Event date:01.04.2003 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:STOKKE GRUPPEN AS
 
Event date:01.04.2003 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:WONDERLAND AS
 
Event date:08.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE RPEO
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN AMENDED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO
 
Event date:22.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:01.05.2003 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20030319
 
Event date:13.02.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:01.09.2005 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:WONDERLAND AS
Effective DATE:20050701
 
Event date:01.09.2005 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1
Owner Name:STOKKE AS
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20150310
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20150224
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20150311
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20150309
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20150311
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20150311
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:01.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69606283 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:02.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20160229
 
Event date:07.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20160301
 
Event date:03.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED