Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0813379

EP0813379 - FRAME MATTRESS HAVING A REMOVABLE MATTRESS COVER AND A TURNABLE MATTRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STOKKE GRUPPEN AS
2620 Skodje / NO
[2002/44]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
Westnofa Industrier A/S
Postboks 104
6301 Andalsnes / NO
Inventor(s)01 / SLETTAOYEN, Odd
Postboks 104
N-6301 Andalsnes / NO
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Wablat, Wolfgang , et al
Patentanwalt
Dr. Dr. W. Wablat
Potsdamer Chaussee 48
14129 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. , et al
Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48
14129 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/52]Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr.
Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48
14129 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96906960.801.03.1996
[1997/52]
WO1996NO00049
Priority number, dateNO1995000092410.03.1995         Original published format: NO 950924
[1997/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9628071
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0813379
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1997/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0813379
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0813379
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47C21/06
[1997/52]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FI,   NL,   SE [1997/52]
TitleGerman:LIEGEFLÄCHENRAHMEN MIT ABNEHMBAREM MATRATZENÜBERZUG UND WENDBARER MATRATZE[1997/52]
English:FRAME MATTRESS HAVING A REMOVABLE MATTRESS COVER AND A TURNABLE MATTRESS[1997/52]
French:MATELAS A CADRE COMPRENANT UNE ENVELOPPE AMOVIBLE ET UN MATELAS POUVANT ETRE RETOURNE[1997/52]
Entry into regional phase26.08.1997National basic fee paid 
26.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
26.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/52]
29.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.1999Fee for grant paid
02.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000   
Scapa Bedding AB
Box 70
330 17 RYDAHOLM / SE
Opponent's representative
Wallin, Bo-Göran
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000   
Scapa Bedding AB
Box 70
330 17 RYDAHOLM / SE
Opponent's representative
Wallin, Bo-Göran
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
24.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.06.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
11.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.06.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.07.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.10.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.01.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US4274169  (STANDIFORD NATALIE C);
 [X]US4541137  (MURRAY LESTER K [US]);
 [Y]US5231714  (MOSSBECK NIELS [US]);
 [Y]NO144509B  (WESTNOFA IND AS [NO]);
 [Y]NO149198B  (DONKERS KONFEKTION [SE])
Examination   - Drawing filed on 01.03.99 with letter of 26.02.99 and showing the closest prior art.,
OppositionDE2536882
 SE505654
 US4389743
 US5136741
 WO9505767