blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0814664 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0814664



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 552
28.07.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.02.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
07.02.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
09.01.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
01.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.11.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.11.2006 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
28.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
26.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 21
06.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
06.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
06.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
06.07.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.06.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.06.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
24.02.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
30.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2004 Claims Appeal 1
16.01.2004 Claims Appeal 1
16.01.2004 Claims Appeal 1
16.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
07.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
13.11.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
05.11.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.06.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.06.2003 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
11.06.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
06.06.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 33
27.05.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.03.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
15.02.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
30.01.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
30.01.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
30.01.2003 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
30.01.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
30.01.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
30.01.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.09.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.08.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
26.08.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
26.08.2002 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
24.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
19.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.03.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.12.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
05.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.10.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.06.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
30.05.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
04.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.11.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Request for documents Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
23.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
23.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
19.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 5
13.07.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Annex Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
02.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.11.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.11.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.10.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
06.10.1997 Description Search / examination 2
06.10.1997 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.10.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
06.10.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
22.12.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
22.12.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
29.10.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.09.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.09.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
19.09.1996 Priority document Search / examination 18