blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0814664
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH11501810Global Dossier 16.02.1999A
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0814664Global Dossier 19.01.2000B1
EP0814664 07.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT188841T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5102596 02.10.1996A
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69606284D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69606284T 25.05.2000T2
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0814664T 08.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EE9700204 16.02.1998A
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3032998T 31.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU224337 29.08.2005B1
HU9801833 28.12.2001A3
HU9801833 28.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO974254L 15.09.1997L
NO974254D 15.09.1997D0
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL181915B 31.10.2001B1
PL322256 19.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK281522B 09.04.2001B6
SK122697 04.02.1998A3
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6103279 15.08.2000A
Priority number Date
EP9600948 06.03.1996
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9628035Global Dossier 19.09.1996A1
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2008131959Global Dossier 12.06.2008A
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CH689505 31.05.1999A5
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ292729 17.12.2003B6
CZ286197 18.02.1998A3
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2142050T 01.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT814664E 28.04.2000E
Priority number Date
CH73195 15.03.1995