Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0814664

EP0814664 - A STRUCTURE FOR A FOOD PRODUCT WITH A WAFER SHELL AND A CREAMY FILLING, FOR EXAMPLE, FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SEMI-COLD FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  LU  AT  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
SOREMARTEC S.A.
Drève de l'Arc-en-Ciel 102
6700 Arlon-Schoppach / BE
For:IT 
Ferrero S.p.A.
Piazzale Pietro Ferrero 1
12051 Alba (Cuneo) / IT
For:DE 
FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT m.b.H.
Hainer Weg 120
60599 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  LU  AT  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
SOREMARTEC S.A.
Drève de l'Arc en Ciel 102
6700 Arlon-Schoppach / BE
For:IT 
Ferrero S.p.A.
Piazzale Pietro Ferrero 1
12051 Alba (Cuneo) / IT
For:DE 
FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT m.b.H.
Hainer Weg 120
D-60599 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1999/34]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  LU  AT  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
SOREMARTEC S.A.
Drève de l'Arc en Ciel 102
6700 Arlon-Schoppach / BE
For:IT 
Ferrero S.p.A.
Piazzale Pietro Ferrero 1
I-12051 Alba (Cuneo) / IT
For:DE 
FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT m.b.H.
Hainer Weg 120
D-60599 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1998/02]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  LU  AT  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Sore-Martec S.A:
Drève de l'Arc-en-Ciel 102
6700 Arlon/Schoppach / BE
For:IT 
Ferrero S.p.A.
Piazzale Pietro Ferrero 1
I-12051 Alba (Cuneo) / IT
For:DE 
FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT m.b.H.
Hainer Weg 120
D-60599 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FERRERO, Pietro
Avenue Lequime 64
B-1640 Rhode-St-Genese / BE
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Rambelli, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Rambelli, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
Former [1999/49]Rambelli, Paolo , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Former [1998/02]Bosotti, Luciano , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date96907367.506.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996EP00948
Priority number, dateCH1995000073115.03.1995         Original published format: CH 73195
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628035
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0814664
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0814664
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:A21D13/08, A23G3/00
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/02]
Extension statesLT04.10.1997
LV04.10.1997
SI04.10.1997
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR EINES MIT KREME GEFÜLLTEN LEBENSMITTELS MIT WAFFELSCHALE, ZUM BEISPIEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KALTEN LEBENSMITTELS[1999/35]
English:A STRUCTURE FOR A FOOD PRODUCT WITH A WAFER SHELL AND A CREAMY FILLING, FOR EXAMPLE, FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SEMI-COLD FOOD PRODUCTS[1998/02]
French:STRUCTURE POUR PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE PRESENTANT UNE COQUE EN GAUFRETTE FOURREE A L'AIDE D'UN PRODUIT CREMEUX, PAR EXEMPLE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES SEMI-FROIDS[1998/02]
Former [1998/02]STRUKTUR VON EINES MIT KREME GEFÜLLTES LEBENSMITTEL MIT WAFFELSCHALE FÜR DAS VERFAHREN VON ZUM BEISPIELE EINES KALTES LEBENSMITTEL
Entry into regional phase04.10.1997National basic fee paid 
04.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1999Fee for grant paid
01.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000   
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Marchant, James Ian, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000   
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Marchant, James Ian, et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
22.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.12.2006Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/16]
Appeal following opposition27.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0430/03
06.06.2003Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
19.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.01.2000
LU06.03.2000
MC30.09.2000
AT06.03.2002
IE06.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2003/46]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
AT06.03.2002
IE06.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/31]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
AT06.03.2002
IE06.03.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/21]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
IE06.03.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/18]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
IE06.03.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/17]FI19.01.2000
MC31.03.2000
IE06.03.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/09]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
NL01.10.2002
Former [2001/29]FI19.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/24]MC30.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO8802990  (DRUMSTICK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,6,8; claims 1,6 * [Y] 3-10;
 [Y]EP0086319  (FERRERO SPA [IT]) [Y] 3-10 * figure -; claim - *