Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0815292

EP0815292 - PROCESS FOR THE SELECTIVE OR PARTIAL ELECTROLYTIC METALLIZATION OF SURFACES OF SUBSTRATES MADE FROM NON-CONDUCTING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Revocation of patentpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20-24
10553 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MIDDEKE, Hermann
Hindenburgdamm 127
D-12203 Berlin / DE
02 / MC CASKIE, John
Tannenbergallee 26
D-14055 Berlin / DE
03 / JOSHI, Nayan, H.
2168 Summers Glen
Rock Hill, SC-29732 / US
[1998/11]
Former [1998/02]01 / MIDDEKE, Hermann
Hindenburgdamm 127
D-12203 Berlin / DE
02 / MC CASKIE, John
Tannenbergallee 26
D-14055 Berlin / DE
03 / JOSHI, Nayan, H.
8 Bennet Court
East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]Effert, Bressel und Kollegen
Radickestrasse 48
12489 Berlin / DE
Former [1998/02]Effert, Udo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Radickestrasse 48
12489 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96907505.015.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996EP01190
Priority number, dateDE199511085517.03.1995         Original published format: DE 19510855
[1998/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9629452
Date:26.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815292
Date:07.01.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0815292
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:C25D5/54
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN ODER PARTIELLEN ELEKTROLYTISCHEN METALLISIEREN VON OBERFLÄCHEN VON SUBSTRATEN AUS NICHTLEITENDEN MATERIALIEN[1998/02]
English:PROCESS FOR THE SELECTIVE OR PARTIAL ELECTROLYTIC METALLIZATION OF SURFACES OF SUBSTRATES MADE FROM NON-CONDUCTING MATERIALS[1998/02]
French:PROCEDE DE METALLISATION ELECTROLYTIQUE SELECTIVE OU PARTIELLE DE SURFACES DE SUBSTRATS COMPOSES DE MATERIAUX NON CONDUCTEURS[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1997National basic fee paid 
03.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
30.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
26.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.10.2000   
Enthone-OMI (Deutschland) GmbH
Heerdter Buschstrasse 1 - 3
41460 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Rausch, Michael
Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  24.10.2000   
Shipley Company L.L.C.
272 Buffalo Avenue
Freeport, N.Y. 11520 / US
Opponent's representative
Bausch, Thorsten
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.2000   
Enthone-OMI (Deutschland) GmbH
Heerdter Buschstrasse 1 - 3
41460 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Rausch, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  24.10.2000   
Shipley Company L.L.C.
272 Buffalo Avenue
Freeport, N.Y. 11520 / US
Opponent's representative
Bausch, Thorsten
Hoffmann.Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
27.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2002Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.12.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2277745  (ENTHONE OMI [IT], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 8; claims 1,3,4 *;
 [X]EP0538006  (ENTHONE OMI INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 6; example 2 * * column 7; claim 2 * * column 8; claim 8 *;
 [XD]EP0616053  (ATOTECH USA INC [US]) [XD] 1-6 * page 7, line 31 - line 50 *;
 [A]WO9317153  (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] * page 3, line 30 *