Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0817568

EP0817568 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO OVENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNITED BISCUITS (UK) LIMITED
Church Road West Drayton
Middlesex UB7 7PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]For all designated states
UNITED BISCUITS (UK) LIMITED
Church Road
West Drayton, Middlesex UB7 7PR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SHAW, Simon, Henry
7 Normans Court, 76 Micklefield Road
High Wycombe HP13 7EY / GB
02 / ROLSTON, Robert, Mitchell
13 Hawthorn Crescent, Hazelmere
High Wycombe HP15 7PL / GB
[1998/03]
Representative(s)Humphreys, Ceris Anne , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]Humphreys, Ceris Anne , et al
Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date96908224.727.03.1996
[1998/03]
WO1996GB00728
Priority number, dateGB1995000633728.03.1995         Original published format: GB 9506337
[1998/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9629876
Date:03.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0817568
Date:14.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0817568
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:A21B1/40, A21B1/48
[1998/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/12]
Former [1998/03]BE,  DE,  DK,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:BACKOFEN[1998/03]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO OVENS[1998/03]
French:AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES FOURS[1998/03]
Entry into regional phase02.10.1997National basic fee paid 
02.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/03]
15.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
FR09.02.2000
IT09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
DK09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
DE10.05.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/35]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
FR09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
DK09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
DE10.05.2000
Former [2003/46]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
DK09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
DE10.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2003/09]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
SE09.05.2000
DE10.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2002/11]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
SE09.05.2000
DE10.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/50]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
IE27.03.2000
SE09.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/29]BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/16]BE09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/09]BE09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/08]BE09.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]CH456493  (BAKER PERKINS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2126719  (SIMON VICARS LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5197375  (ROSENBROCK RICHARD [US], et al) [A] * column A *;
 [A]EP0081352  (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US])