Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0815673

EP0815673 - DROP FROM FRONT OF BUFFER POLICY IN FEEDBACK NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telcordia Technologies, Inc.
445 South Street
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[1999/51]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC.
445 South Street
Morristown, New Jersey 07960-6438 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAKSHMAN, Tirunell, Viswanathan
58 Victoria Drive
Eatontown, NJ 07724 / US
02 / NEIDHARDT, Arnold, Leslie
574 Clubhouse Drive
Middletown, NJ 07748 / US
03 / OTT, Teunis Jan
31 Mountain View Drive
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/19]Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1998/02]Dubois-Chabert, Guy , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96908676.805.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996US03047
Priority number, dateUS1995040788220.03.1995         Original published format: US 407882
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9629798
Date:26.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815673
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996
[1998/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/56
[2000/17]
Former International [1998/02]H04L12/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1998/02]
TitleGerman:VON PUFFERFRONT AUSGEHENDES WEGWERFVERFAHREN IN RÜCKGEKOPPELTEN NETZEN[1998/02]
English:DROP FROM FRONT OF BUFFER POLICY IN FEEDBACK NETWORKS[1998/02]
French:ABANDON DES PREMIERS PAQUETS OU CELLULES RECUS DANS UN PROTOCOLE A ORGANE TAMPON, DANS DES RESEAUX DE CONTRE-REACTION[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase25.09.1997National basic fee paid 
25.09.1997Search fee paid 
25.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
07.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/20]
12.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9305596  (ADAPTIVE CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 7 - line 16; claim 1 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 3 * * page 9, line 17 - line 24 *
 [X]  FANG C ET AL, "A SIMULATION STUDY OF TCP PERFORMANCE IN ATM NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, ISBN 0-7803-1821-8, page 1217-1223, XP000488729 [X] 1-12 * page 1217, column L, line 17 - line 25 * * page 1217, column L, line 48 - column R, line 9 * * page 1217, column R, line 39 - line 48 * * page 1218, column R, line 3 - line 32 * * page 1218, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 1221, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *
International search[A]US5276677  (RAMAMURTHY GOPALAKRISHNAN [US], et al);
 [AP]US5402416  (CIESLAK RANDALL A [US], et al)