Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893142

EP0893142 - MASK FOR TREATING COLD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yasuda, Saburo
5ban, 1-104go, Kanbara, Nisinomiya-si
Hyogo 662 / JP
[1999/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Brehm, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Brehm, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
81369 München / DE
Former [1999/04]Brehm, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date96909351.710.04.1996
[1999/04]
WO1996JP01007
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9632160
Date:17.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0893142
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996
[1999/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.10.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A62B18/02, A61M16/06
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/04]A62B18/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/04]
TitleGerman:MASK ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ERKÄLTUNG[1999/04]
English:MASK FOR TREATING COLD[1999/04]
French:MASQUE DE TRAITEMENT DES REFROIDISSEMENTS[1999/04]
Entry into regional phase13.08.1998Translation filed 
13.08.1998National basic fee paid 
13.08.1998Search fee paid 
13.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
01.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/18]
23.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE8906445U  (RUTHER HANS MARTIN) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 6 - paragraph 7; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE29508234U  (RUTHER HANS MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 7 - line 11 * * page 7, line 10 - line 16 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2410903  (ANN ROGGE MARION) [X] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2664084  (HERBERT HAMMERMANN) [X] 1 * column 3, line 33 - line 37 * * figure 1 *
International search[X]JPS6426048U  ;
 [Y]JPH0391364U  ;
 [Y]JPS63186447U
by applicantJPS60240330
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN,