Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0808463

EP0808463 - WEATHER RADAR USING SPECTRAL GAUSSIAN ENVELOPE DISCRIMINATION FOR CLUTTER REJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDAO, Ruy, L.
5110 NE 14th Terrace
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33334 / US
02 / MANSEUR, Arezki
11391 Whisper Sound Drive
Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US
03 / SPIRES, Randall, C.
1343 SW Walnut Terrace
Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US
04 / WEIST, William, C.
2400 N.W. 29th Road
Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US
05 / HERMANN, Philip, R.
7015 NW 38th Manor
Coral Springs, FL 33065 / US
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Poidatz, Emmanuel , et al
Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 96, Boulevard Malesherbes
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]Poidatz, Emmanuel , et al
Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 96, Boulevard Malesherbes
75017 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96909476.201.02.1996
[1997/48]
WO1996US01492
Priority number, dateUS1995038549408.02.1995         Original published format: US 385494
[1997/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9624858
Date:15.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808463
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808463
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/292, G01S13/95
[1997/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/48]
TitleGerman:WETTERRADAR MIT SPEKTRALER GAUSS-EINHULLENDEN DISKRIMINIERUNG ZUM BESEITIGEN VON CLUTTER[1997/48]
English:WEATHER RADAR USING SPECTRAL GAUSSIAN ENVELOPE DISCRIMINATION FOR CLUTTER REJECTION[1997/48]
French:RADAR METEOROLOGIQUE UTILISANT UNE TECHNIQUE DE DISCRIMINATION D'ENVELOPPE GAUSSIENNE SPECTRALE POUR LA SUPPRESSION DES ECHOS PARASITES[1997/48]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1997National basic fee paid 
03.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
21.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2000Fee for grant paid
24.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE4041204  (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 53 * [Y] 6-8;
 [Y]US4104631  (WEIGLE WAYNE L, et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 51 *;
 [XY]JPS62129774  ;
 [A]US4742353  (D ADDIO EGIDIO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 57 *;
 [A]JPH06214016
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871117), vol. 011, no. 350, Database accession no. (P - 637), & JP62129774 A 19870612 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 6-8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941107), vol. 018, no. 581, Database accession no. (P - 1822), & JP06214016 A 19940805 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract *