blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0814884

EP0814884 - IMPROVEMENTS IN MEMBRANE PROCESSES INCLUDING ELECTRODIALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IONICS INCORPORATED
65 Grove Street Watertown
Massachusetts 02172 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
IONICS INCORPORATED
65 Grove Street
Watertown Massachusetts 02172 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDSTEIN, Arthur, L.
24 Hubbard Road
Weston, MA 02193 / US
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David, et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]Greenwood, John David, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Former [1998/02]Harvey, David Gareth, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date96909757.519.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996US03700
Priority number, dateUS1995041042323.03.1995         Original published format: US 410423
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9629133
Date:26.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0814884
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B01D15/04, B01D17/06, B01D25/12, B01D25/22, B01D61/42, B01D61/44, B01D61/46, B01D61/48, B01D61/50, B01D61/52, B01D63/08
[2000/01]
CPC:
B01D53/228 (EP,US); B01D61/48 (EP,US); B01D61/50 (EP,US);
B01D63/081 (EP,US); B01D63/084 (EP,US); B01J47/08 (EP,US);
B01D2313/14 (EP,US); C02F1/4693 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1998/02]B01D15/04, B01D17/06, B01D25/12, B01D25/22, B01D61/42, B01D61/44, B01D61/46, B01D61/48, B01D61/50, B01D61/52, B01D63/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1998/02]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN VON MEMBRANVERFAHREN, EINSCHLIESSLICH ELEKTRODIALYSE[1998/02]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN MEMBRANE PROCESSES INCLUDING ELECTRODIALYSIS[1998/02]
French:AMELIORATIONS DES TRAITEMENTS PAR MEMBRANE NOTAMMENT L'ELECTRODIALYSE[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase02.09.1997National basic fee paid 
02.09.1997Search fee paid 
02.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
14.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
28.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/14]
Request for further processing for:14.12.2002Request for further processing filed
14.12.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.01.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US4804451  (PALMER KEITH A [US]);
 [Y]US5066375  (PARSI EDGARDO J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2897130  (DORSSER AREND HUBREGT DE HAAS, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.