blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0815524

EP0815524 - DEBIT CARD SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING INCENTIVE AWARD PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maritz Inc.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
[1998/02]
Inventor(s)01 / CARRITHERS, David, C.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
02 / RAPP, Steven, G.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
03 / STONE, Gayla, L.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
04 / STOREY-WALLER, Jody, A.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
05 / RESCH, Kim, A.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
06 / McGUIRE, Kelly, K.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
07 / ASHBY, Toni, L.
1375 North Highway Drive
Fenton, MO 63099 / US
08 / JACKSON, Mark
800 Market Street
St. Louis, MO 63166-0236 / US
09 / HUFF, Lowell
800 Market Street
St. Louis, MO 63166-0236 / US
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Gill, David Alan, et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]Gill, David Alan, et al
W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2002/26]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
W.P. Thompson & Co, Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Former [2000/39]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Former [1998/02]Hector, Annabel Mary
W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date96909769.020.03.1996
[1998/02]
WO1996US03724
Priority number, dateUS1995040869021.03.1995         Original published format: US 408690
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9629668
Date:26.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0815524
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60
[1998/02]
CPC:
G07F7/02 (EP); G06Q20/02 (EP); G06Q20/023 (EP);
G06Q20/04 (EP); G06Q20/3437 (EP); G06Q30/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEBITKARTEN ZUM EINRICHTEN EINES ANREGUNGS- UND BELOHNUNGSPROGRAMMS[1998/02]
English:DEBIT CARD SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING INCENTIVE AWARD PROGRAM[1998/02]
French:SYSTEME DE CARTE DE DEBIT ET PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION D'UN PROGRAMME DE PRIME D'INCITATION[1998/02]
Entry into regional phase18.09.1997National basic fee paid 
18.09.1997Search fee paid 
18.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
24.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/17]
16.12.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/17]
Appeal following examination29.09.2005Appeal received No.  T0164/06
14.12.2005Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
16.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.10.2002M01   Fee paid on   04.11.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5336870  (HUGHES THOMAS S ET AL) [X] 1,3,8,9,12 * column 2, lines 10-14 * * column 3, lines 30-68 * * column 6, lines 38-63 * * figures 3,5 * [Y] 2,4-7,10,11;
 [X]US5321243  (GROVES DAVID H ET AL) [X] 1,3,8,9,12 * column 1, lines 43-61 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 1 * * column 6, lines 52-62 *;
 [X]US5255182  (ADAMS CARL A) [X] 1,3,8,9 * column 1, lines 33-35 * * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 4 *;
 [YA]US5223699  (FLYNN LORRAINE ET AL) [Y] 4,5,7 * figures 3,5 * * column 3, lines 39-65 * * column 7, lines 19-32 * * column 2, lines 55-59 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US5287268  (MCCARTHY PATRICK D) [Y] 6,10 * figure - * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 57 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, lines 43-50 * * column 5, lines 19-60 * * column 6, lines 50-61 * [A] 1;
 [YA]GB2274349  (HTEC LTD) [Y] 11 * figure - * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * [A] 1,2;
 [YA]WO8911130  (HUMBLE DAVID RAYMOND) [Y] 2 * page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 18 * * figure 1 * * claim 8 * [A] 1,10;
 [A]US5056019  (IRION DONALD ET AL) [A] 10 * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 13 * * column 10, lines 35-43 *;
 [A]US5256863  (FERGUSON WILLIAM L ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5025372  (BURTON JAMES F ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5287268  ;
 [Y]US5025372
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.