EP0823973 - QUALITITATIVE DETECTION OF ADDED ALBUMEN HYDROLYSATES IN FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Timmermann, Detlef Landert 9 31860 Emmerthal / DE | [2000/37] |
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states Timmermann, Detlef Bürgermeister-Fink-Strasse 28 30169 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rehmann, Thorsten Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [1998/08] | Rehmann, Klaus-Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing. GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 96909958.9 | 04.04.1996 | [1998/08] | WO1996DE00645 | Priority number, date | DE19951016077 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516077 | [1998/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635125 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823973 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823973 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/02, G01N33/12 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1998/08] | Title | German: | QUALITATIVER NACHWEIS VON ZUGESETZTEN EIWEISSHYDROLYSATEN IN LEBENSMITTELN | [1998/08] | English: | QUALITITATIVE DETECTION OF ADDED ALBUMEN HYDROLYSATES IN FOODSTUFFS | [1998/08] | French: | IDENTIFICATION QUALITATIVE D'HYDROLYSATS D'ALBUMEN AJOUTES A DES ALIMENTS | [1998/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/08] | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.09.2000 | GB | 13.09.2000 | NL | 13.09.2000 | BE | 30.04.2001 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | GB | 13.09.2000 | |
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
BE | 30.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | GB | 13.09.2000 | |
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
BE | 30.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 13.09.2000 | |
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/28] | GB | 13.09.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8707722 (SVALOEF AB [SE]) [A] 1-7; | [A]WO9014438 (THOMAS MELVILLE A [US])[A] 1-7 |