Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767590

EP0767590 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR SYNCHRONIZING PHASE OF VIDEO SIGNAL, AND COMBINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAUCHI, Etsuro
Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / MOGI, Yasuhide
Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / FUKUDA, Tokuya
Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
[1997/15]
Representative(s)DeVile, Jonathan Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/14]DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr. , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [1997/15]Cotter, Ivan John , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96910206.019.04.1996
[1997/15]
WO1996JP01071
Priority number, dateJP1995009673121.04.1995         Original published format: JP 9673195
[1997/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9633577
Date:24.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767590
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996
[1997/15]
Search report(s)International search reportJP24.10.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/76, H04N9/64
[2000/48]
Former International [1997/15]H04N9/74
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNG ZUR PHASENSYNCHRONISATION VON VIDEOSIGNALEN UND KOMBINATIONSVORRICHTUNG[1997/15]
English:METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR SYNCHRONIZING PHASE OF VIDEO SIGNAL, AND COMBINING DEVICE[1997/15]
French:PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT DE SYNCHRONISATION DE PHASE D'UN SIGNAL VIDEO, ET DISPOSITIF COMBINE[1997/15]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1996Translation filed 
04.12.1996National basic fee paid 
04.12.1996Search fee paid 
04.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/15]
24.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/08]
04.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200611   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0406698  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 39 * [A] 10-12;
 [PX]EP0691791  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [PX] 1-12 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 50 *;
 [A]EP0369471  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 7 - line 57; figure 3 *
International search[X]JPS6489692  (TOSHIBA CORP)